CA AB2668 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65913.4 and 66016.5 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2668 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB2668 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2668 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB2668 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2668 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5368.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4699.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66016.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |