CA AB2667 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Reconsideration granted. (Page 5795.) Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Reconsideration granted. (Page 5795.) Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.
Title
Civil rights: Unruh Civil Rights Act: waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2667 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5795.) Stricken from file. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 36. Page 5052.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Thurmond. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4852.) |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 26). |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |