CA AB2666 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1653.5 of, and to add Section 1808.26 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Motor Vehicles: interagency agreement: career technical education program students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and HIGHER ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1653.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code1808.26New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback