CA AB2666 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1653.5 of, and to add Section 1808.26 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: interagency agreement: career technical education program students.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1653.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1808.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |