CA AB2665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15101 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots: processing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB2665 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2665 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5286.).
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5212.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code15101Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback