CA AB2664 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 67458 to the Education Code, relating to collegiate athletics.
Title
Collegiate athletics: coaches: misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67458 | New Code | See Bill Text |