CA AB2660 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 11.2 (commencing with Section 25230) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste: surplus household consumer products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2660 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-18SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25230New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback