CA AB2659 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8261, 35147, 35514, 35531, 35545, 35555, 35556, 35559, 35561, 35562, 35563, 35566, 35572, 35574, 35576, 35577, 35578, 35579, 35700.1, 35705.5, 35706, 35706.5, 35708, 35709, 35710, 35711, 35720.5, 35736, 35740, 35753, 35754, 35755, 35759, 35780, 35780.1, 37223, 41326, 41327.2, 41339, 42103, 42127.1, 46600, 47605.1, 47605.6, 47612.1, 48300, 51781, 52302.8, 52520, 56337.5, 56339, 56426.6, 56441.11, 56475, 60800, and 60900 of, and to repeal Sections 32253, 41020.6, 41320.3, and 49082 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 12 of Chapter 525 of the Statutes of 1995, relating to elementary and secondary education.
Title
Elementary and secondary education: omnibus revisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Young Kim [R] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2659 ED. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By O'DONNELL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2659 Committee On ED. (O'Donnell) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2659 ED. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2659 Committee On ED. (O'Donnell) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2659 ED. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5815.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4871.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |