CA AB2658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6310, 6311, and 6399.7 of, and to add Section 6311.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational safety and health: hazards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2658 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2658 Burke By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2658 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5428.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-05SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 4770.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6310Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code6311Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code6311.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code6399.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback