CA AB2658 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 11546.8 and 11546.9 of the Government Code, relating to blockchain technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of the Government Operations Agency: working group: blockchain technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2658 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5483.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1624.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1633.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1633.75New CodeSee Bill Text
Corporations Code25612.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11546.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11546.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code38.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback