CA AB2657 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 22 (commencing with Section 28000) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to social media.
Title
Social Media Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 28000 | New Code | See Bill Text |