CA AB2656 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.5 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing Accountability Act: disapprovals: California Environmental Quality Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2656 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2656 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F. and E.Q. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |