CA AB2655 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1305 of the Penal Code, relating to bail.
Title
Bail: jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2655 Weber (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2655 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2655 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4717.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4675.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |