CA AB2651 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 4450) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol drug counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2024-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2024-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2024-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4450New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback