CA AB2649 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-28 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-28 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 147.6 to, and to repeal and add Section 147.5 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
State Water Project: water supply contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2649 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2649 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5853.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 5639.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10720.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1348 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1425 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1426 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1432 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1442 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 147.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1704.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |