CA AB2647 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1162 to the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: criminal history information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1162 | New Code | See Bill Text |