CA AB2645 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39719 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: forestry and fire prevention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39719Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback