CA AB2644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 37222.20 to the Education Code, and to add Section 6729 to the Government Code, relating to Dolores Huerta Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dolores Huerta Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2644 Reyes et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2644 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5112.).
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and ED.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code37222.20New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code2105Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6729New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback