CA AB2642 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 2104.1 of the Probate Code, relating to guardianship.
Title
Guardianship: special immigrant juveniles.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2642 Levine By Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2642 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2642 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5046.). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5002.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 1455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2104.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |