CA AB2641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26050 and 26200 of, to add Chapter 14.5 (commencing with Section 26145) to Division 10 of, and to repeal Section 26146 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: licenses: onsite sales: temporary events.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2641 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2641 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 5658.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26145 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26146 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |