CA AB2640 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5515 of, and to add Sections 2081.11 and 3858 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fully protected species: Lost River sucker and shortnose sucker limited take authorization: California condor limited take authorization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2640 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2640 Wood By McGuire (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2640 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5941.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5164.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2081.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3858New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code5515Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback