CA AB2640 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5515 of, and to add Sections 2081.11 and 3858 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Fully protected species: Lost River sucker and shortnose sucker limited take authorization: California condor limited take authorization.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2640 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2640 Wood By McGuire (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2640 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2640 Wood By McGuire (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2640 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 7005.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5941.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5164.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2081.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3858 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 5515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |