CA AB2635 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 23 (commencing with Section 3273.70) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Agritourism Liability Act: agritourism civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2024-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-04-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2024-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2024-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
2024-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2024-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3273.70New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback