CA AB2635 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2574 and 42238.02 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: local control funding formula: supplemental grants: lowest performing pupil subgroup or subgroups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2635 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5482.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 2574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42238.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |