CA AB2634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 545, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 545, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10113.70 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Life insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2634 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2634 Chau By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2634 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2634 Chau By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2634 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 545, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6839.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5804.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10113.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |