CA AB2629 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69951 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 69950 of, and to add and repeal Section 69950.5 of, the Government Code, relating to court reporters.
Title
Court reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2629 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2629 Roger Hern (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2629 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2629 Roger Hern (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2629 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6306.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 5247.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5199.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 69951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |