CA AB2628 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14202, 14203, 14204, 14205, 14221, and 14230 of, and to add Section 14013.5 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development: Renewable Energy Workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From committee without further action. | |
2010-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2628&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2628_bill_20100219_introduced.html |