CA AB2627 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3513 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to migratory birds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Migratory nongame birds: Migratory Bird Treaty Act: authorized take.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2627 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26).
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 34. Page 5659.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code3513Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback