CA AB2626 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2253 and 3502.4 of, and to add Sections 2746.6 and 2761.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medical Board of California: licensee discipline: abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2626 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2626 Calderon et al. By Kamlager Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2626 Calderon Third Reading Urgency (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2626 Calderon Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2626 Calderon et al. By Kamlager Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2626 Calderon Third Reading Urgency (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2626 Calderon Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5387.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 4824.). |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 4708.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 5). |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2746.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2761.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3502.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |