CA AB2622 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7027.2 and 7048 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: exemptions: work and advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2622 Juan Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2622 Juan Carrillo By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2622 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2622 Juan Carrillo By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2622 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 6434.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5243.). |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 5495.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7027.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |