CA AB2620 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16428.8 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Sections 17052.11 and 23652.11 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to telecommuting.
Title
Income taxes: credits: telecommuting: transfer of funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16428.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23652.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |