CA AB262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and renumber the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 3400) of Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 3500) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: bid specifications: Buy Clean California Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 262 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB262 Bonta et al. By Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 262 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 3282.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2696.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and EQ.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 1954.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2017-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Reconsideration granted.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES.
2017-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2017-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code10130New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10170New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10503.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10504.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10727New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10768New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code3400Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code3500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback