CA AB2617 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.8 (commencing with Section 390) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water efficiency measures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-01 - Assembly - (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5117.)
2016-05-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-05-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-14AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12).
2016-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2016-03-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25685New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code390New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2617&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_bill_20160219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_bill_20160328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_bill_20160414_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_bill_20160527_amended_asm_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_vote_20160412_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_vote_20160527_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2617_vote_20160601_0151PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback