CA AB2614 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.4 (commencing with Section 5660) to Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to outdoor experiences.
Title
Outdoor experiences: community access program: grant program.
Sponsors
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2614 CARRILLO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2614 Carrillo et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2614 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2614 Carrillo et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2614 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6856.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 5764.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 5594.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 18 corrected. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5660 | New Code | See Bill Text |