CA AB2611 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27 to the Government Code, relating to businesses.
Title
California family-owned businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB2611 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2611 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2611 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.). |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4259.) |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |