CA AB2608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 128455 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Mental Health Service Provider Education Program: former foster youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2608 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2608 Mark Stone et al. By Beall (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2608 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 6625.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 5511.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5663.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback