CA AB2606 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25200 and 25205.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: facilities: permits: renewals.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2606 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2606 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 5607.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |