CA AB2605 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 226.75 of the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Rest breaks: petroleum facilities: safety-sensitive positions.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2605 Gipson Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2605 Gipson et al. By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2605 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2605 Gipson et al. By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2605 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 6141.). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 5664.) |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 5664.) |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5380.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1531.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 226.75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |