CA AB2605 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65460.5 and 65923.8 of, to amend and renumber Section 12019.5 of, to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 12097) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 to, and to repeal Section 66033 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 25199.7 of, and to repeal Section 25199.4 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 25616 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: Office of Permit Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2605 Nazarian (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2605 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2605 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4651.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4687.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and E.S. & T.M. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65460.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65923.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66033 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25199.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25199.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25616 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 488 | Amended Code | Citation Text |