CA AB2603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7583.23 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Private security services: private patrol operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2603 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5131.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7574.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7583.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7583.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7583.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |