CA AB2597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 2100) to Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctuary State Contracting Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code2100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback