CA AB2597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to University of California, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Programs in Medical Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2597 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5644.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback