CA AB2597 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 366.26, 11253.2, and 16519.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Resource family approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11253.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |