CA AB2596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7284.2, 7284.4, 7284.6, and 7284.10 of, and to repeal Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 7282) of Division 7 of Title 1 of, the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: data sharing.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7282 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7284.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7284.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7284.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7284.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2596 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2596 |