CA AB2594 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10561.7 to the Water Code, relating to stormwater.
Title
Stormwater resources: use of captured water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2594 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2594 Gordon By Pavley (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2594 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2594 Gordon By Pavley (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2594 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6298.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5227.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 4897.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4853.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 11). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10561.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |