CA AB2592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7611.11, 7653.36, 7672.4, 7672.10, and 7673 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7607, 7611.9, 7653.35, 7672, 7672.1, 7672.6, 7672.7, 7673.1, and 7685.2 of, to add Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 7714) to Chapter 12 of Division 3 of, and to add Sections 7712.12 and 7730.12 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 7011, 7054, 7054.1, 7116, 7117, 103055, and 103060 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7010.3, 7051, 7051.5, and 7052 of, to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 8390) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 8 of, and to add Sections 7002.7, 7010.8, 7054.5, and 7054.9 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to human remains, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduction of human remains and the disposition of reduced human remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2592 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-20SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4719.)
2020-06-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7607Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7611.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7611.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7653.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7653.36Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7672.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7673Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7673.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7685.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103055Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103060Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7010.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code7011Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7051Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7051.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7052Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7054Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7054.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7116Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code7117Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback