CA AB2592 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10 of, and to add Section 9088.5 to, the Elections Code, and to add Section 12172.6 to the Government Code, relating to the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of State: census outreach and education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2592 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2592 Berman By Pan (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2592 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 6907.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 5900.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code10Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2194Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9088.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code10Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12172.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code9088.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback