CA AB2590 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing: restorative justice.
Sponsors
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2590 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2590 Weber By Hancock (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2590 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2590 Weber By Hancock (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2590 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6461.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5418.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 4950.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4852.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 4). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |