CA AB259 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17054.32 and 23632 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Protecting Our Restaurants Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17054.32 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23632 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |