CA AB2587 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 340.16 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Sexual assault: statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2587 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2587 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 5492.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |